Laura Serebin Named New Flad CEO
Laura Serebin, AIA, LEED AP, has been named president and CEO of Flad Architects. An experienced leader in the design and implementation of healthcare, academic and science and technology facilities, Serebin has been with Flad since 1996 and has served as principal for 12 years.
Serebin succeeds Jeff Zutz, AIA, LEED AP, who has served as president and CEO since 2018 and has helped build and strengthen the firm’s national impact in his 34 years with Flad.
In her 25-plus years with the company, Serebin is an experienced leader in the design and implementation of a wide range of public- and private-sector institutions. Her ability to manage multiple stakeholder groups and focus on a collaborative process, built on consensus and transparency, ensures client vision is maintained throughout the life of a project.
Posted January 9, 2024
More Articles:
- Groundbreaking Celebrates Start of Construction on Penn State Health Cancer Center
- SMH-Venice New Patient Care Tower Opens, Easing Capacity Constraints
- Topping Out Marks Construction Milestone for Sarasota Memorial Bed Tower Expansion
- Spiering Joins Flad Healthcare Team as Director of Strategic Innovation
- Global Security Exchange
Sep 23, 2024 – Sep 25, 2024 - Healthcare Facilities Symposium and Expo
Sep 24, 2024 – Sep 26, 2024 - Association of Energy Engineers World Energy Conference & Expo
Sep 25, 2024 – Sep 27, 2024 - I2SL Annual Conference and Technology Fair
Sep 29, 2024 – Oct 2, 2024